Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4220 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4220
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the juvenile board of Guadalupe
 County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.1001(a), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Guadalupe County Juvenile Board is composed of the
 county judge, the judges of the statutory county courts, and the
 district judges in Guadalupe County. [The county judge may add the
 judge of the county court at law to the board or may, from time to
 time, designate the judge of the county court at law to serve on the
 board in the county judge's place.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *