Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4240 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2021

                            By: Raymond, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4240
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 22, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to local regulation to enforce child custody orders;
 authorizing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 157, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter J to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER J. LOCAL REGULATION AND ENFORCEMENT
 Sec. 157.451.  CIVIL PENALTY FOR INTERFERENCE WITH CHILD
 CUSTODY ORDER. A municipality or county in this state may adopt an
 ordinance or order that imposes a civil penalty of not more than
 $500 for engaging in conduct described by Section 25.03, Penal
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *