Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill May 3, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 30, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 3, 2021