Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | By: Meyer (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 4242 | |
2 | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021; | |
3 | - | May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural | |
4 | - | Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2021, reported favorably | |
5 | - | by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 21, 2021, sent to | |
6 | - | printer.) | |
7 | - | Click here to see the committee vote | |
1 | + | 87R20443 RDS-F | |
2 | + | By: Meyer H.B. No. 4242 | |
8 | 3 | ||
9 | 4 | ||
10 | 5 | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
11 | 6 | AN ACT | |
12 | 7 | relating to the extension of the expiration of certain parts of the | |
13 | 8 | Texas Economic Development Act. | |
14 | 9 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
15 | 10 | SECTION 1. Section 313.007, Tax Code, is amended to read as | |
16 | 11 | follows: | |
17 | 12 | Sec. 313.007. EXPIRATION. Subchapters B and C expire | |
18 | 13 | December 31, 2024 [2022]. | |
19 | 14 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives | |
20 | 15 | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as | |
21 | 16 | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this | |
22 | 17 | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this | |
23 | 18 | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. | |
24 | - | * * * * * |