Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB428 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021