Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis May 4, 2021