1 | | - | H.B. No. 4374 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Cyrier (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4374 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 12, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4374 By: Menéndez |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the use of executory contracts for the purchase of land |
---|
6 | 14 | | to be used as a residence in certain counties. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 5, Property Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 5.0622 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 5.0622. ADDITIONAL APPLICABILITY: CERTAIN COUNTIES. |
---|
11 | 19 | | (a) This section applies only to a county with a population of less |
---|
12 | 20 | | than 100,000 that is located in a metropolitan statistical area as |
---|
13 | 21 | | defined by the federal Office of Management and Budget: |
---|
14 | 22 | | (1) with a population of more than 1.5 million; and |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) adjacent to a different metropolitan statistical |
---|
16 | 24 | | area as defined by the federal Office of Management and Budget with |
---|
17 | 25 | | a population of more than 2 million. |
---|
18 | 26 | | (b) The commissioners court of a county may adopt an order |
---|
19 | 27 | | requiring an executory contract for the conveyance of land used or |
---|
20 | 28 | | to be used as a residence located in the county to be subject to this |
---|
21 | 29 | | subchapter. The order must specify a method for determining |
---|
22 | 30 | | whether the land is used or to be used as a residence. |
---|
23 | 31 | | (c) The order may not include an executory contract for the |
---|
24 | 32 | | conveyance of land: |
---|
25 | 33 | | (1) described by Section 5.062(b), (c), or (d); or |
---|
26 | 34 | | (2) that is to be used primarily for agricultural use, |
---|
27 | 35 | | as defined by Section 1-d, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, or for |
---|
28 | 36 | | farm, ranch, wildlife management, or timber production use within |
---|
29 | 37 | | the meaning of Section 1-d-1, Article VIII, Texas Constitution, and |
---|
30 | 38 | | for which no part of the land is to be used as a residence. |
---|
31 | 39 | | (d) If a tract described by Subsection (c)(2) ceases to be |
---|
32 | 40 | | used primarily for agricultural use or for farm, ranch, wildlife |
---|
33 | 41 | | management, or timber production use, or any part of the land is |
---|
34 | 42 | | used as a residence, the executory contract for the conveyance of |
---|
35 | 43 | | the land may be included in an order authorized by this section. |
---|
36 | 44 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 5, Property Code, is |
---|
37 | 45 | | amended by adding Section 5.087 to read as follows: |
---|
38 | 46 | | Sec. 5.087. ADDITIONAL PROVISIONS: CERTAIN COUNTIES. (a) |
---|
39 | 47 | | This section applies only to a county adopting an order under |
---|
40 | 48 | | Section 5.0622. |
---|
41 | 49 | | (b) The commissioners court may not modify the provisions of |
---|
42 | 50 | | this subchapter except the commissioners court may provide in the |
---|
43 | 51 | | order that an executory contract to which the order applies may not |
---|
44 | 52 | | be used to purchase land for residential purposes unless the |
---|
45 | 53 | | conversion authorized by Section 5.081 is required to occur not |
---|
46 | 54 | | later than three years after the date the executory contract is |
---|
47 | 55 | | entered into. |
---|
48 | 56 | | SECTION 3. Sections 5.0622 and 5.087, Property Code, as |
---|
49 | 57 | | added by this Act, apply only to an executory contract entered into |
---|
50 | 58 | | on or after the date the commissioners court adopts an order |
---|
51 | 59 | | authorized by this Act. |
---|
52 | 60 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
53 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
54 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
55 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4374 was passed by the House on May |
---|
56 | | - | 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
57 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
58 | | - | No. 4374 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, |
---|
59 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
60 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
61 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
62 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4374 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
63 | | - | amendments, on May 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
64 | | - | 0. |
---|
65 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
67 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Date |
---|
69 | | - | __________________ |
---|
70 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 61 | + | * * * * * |
---|