Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4399 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/12/2021

                            87R5650 MWC-D
 By: Goodwin H.B. No. 4399


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of certain instructional procedures
 adopted by public schools due to the coronavirus disease pandemic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.927 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.927.  REPORTING OF CERTAIN INFORMATION RELATED TO
 INSTRUCTIONAL PROCEDURES ADOPTED DUE TO CORONAVIRUS DISEASE
 (COVID-19) PANDEMIC; AGENCY REPORT. (a) The agency by rule shall
 require each school district and open-enrollment charter school to
 report on instructional procedures adopted by the district or
 school due to the coronavirus disease (COVID-19) pandemic,
 including the following information in the form and manner
 prescribed by the agency:
 (1)  the level of student engagement in instruction
 since the onset of the coronavirus disease (COVID-19) pandemic,
 including:
 (A)  the number of students who have been engaged
 in instruction during and after the 2020-2021 school year;
 (B)  the number of students who were not engaged
 in instruction for a period of time during or after the 2020-2021
 school year but who, at the time of the report, are engaged in
 instruction;
 (C)  the number of students who are not, at the
 time of the report, engaged in instruction; and
 (D)  the number of students with whom, at the time
 of the report, the district or school has no contact;
 (2)  the number of student disciplinary incidents,
 including the number of incidents related to:
 (A)  a dress code or hairstyle violation;
 (B)  possessing offensive visual material in a
 learning environment;
 (C)  the required supervision or presence of an
 adult in a remote learning environment; and
 (D)  a violation of the student code of conduct;
 and
 (3)  information regarding student Internet access,
 including:
 (A)  the number of students with access to
 broadband Internet;
 (B)  the types of devices issued by the district
 or school that are used by students to access the Internet for
 learning and instruction;
 (C)  the number of devices issued by the district
 or school to students to facilitate student Internet connectivity;
 (D)  the cost to the district or school of
 providing and maintaining devices issued by the district or school
 for student Internet connectivity; and
 (E)  any cost or charge paid by the student for the
 instructional use of a device issued to the student by the district
 or school for the student's Internet connectivity.
 (b)  The information included in the report required by
 Subsection (a) must be disaggregated by:
 (1)  student race, ethnicity, sex, socioeconomic
 status, and grade level, students enrolled in a special education
 program under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, students of limited English
 proficiency under Section 29.052, and students who are homeless;
 and
 (2)  except for information required by Subsection
 (a)(3), the method by which instruction was offered, including if
 the instruction was offered:
 (A)  in person;
 (B)  remotely and synchronously; or
 (C)  remotely and asynchronously.
 (c)  The rules adopted under Subsection (a) must require a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school to submit the
 first report not later than December 1, 2021. A district or school
 must submit a report required by this section every 90 days.
 (d)  The agency shall prepare and submit a report to the
 legislature based on the information collected under Subsection
 (a). The agency shall submit the first report required under this
 subsection not later than January 1, 2022. The agency must submit a
 report required by this section every 90 days.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.