Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 9, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021