House
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Withdrawn from calendar (contested)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Amended 1-Goldman
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|