Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 11, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2021
Analysis April 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021