Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB448 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/18/2021

                            By: Bailes, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 448
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2021;
 May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of certain eminent domain information to
 property owners through a landowner's bill of rights.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 402.031(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The landowner's bill of rights must notify each property
 owner that the property owner has the right to:
 (1)  notice of the proposed acquisition of the owner's
 property;
 (2)  a bona fide good faith effort to negotiate by the
 entity proposing to acquire the property;
 (3)  an assessment of damages to the owner that will
 result from the taking of the property;
 (4)  a hearing under Chapter 21, Property Code,
 including a hearing on the assessment of damages; [and]
 (5)  an appeal of a judgment in a condemnation
 proceeding, including an appeal of an assessment of damages; and
 (6)  file a written complaint with the Texas Real
 Estate Commission under Section 1101.205, Occupations Code,
 regarding alleged misconduct by a registered easement or
 right-of-way agent acting on behalf of the entity exercising
 eminent domain authority.
 SECTION 2.  The office of the attorney general shall make the
 landowner's bill of rights statement required by Section 402.031,
 Government Code, as amended by this Act, available on the attorney
 general's Internet website not later than December 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 (b)  Section 2 of this Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *