|
06/16/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1793
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Corrected Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended FA1 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA5 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA4 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA3 Springer
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Record vote RV#831
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Postponed 5/6/21 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Amended 1-Paddie
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Postponed 5/5/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Postponed 5/3/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Postponed 4/28/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|