Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis March 17, 2021