Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/21/2021

                            By: Moody (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 451
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 May 4, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to persons authorized to conduct a marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2.202(a) and (b), Family Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The following persons are authorized to conduct a
 marriage ceremony:
 (1)  a licensed or ordained Christian minister or
 priest;
 (2)  a Jewish rabbi;
 (3)  a person who is an officer of a religious
 organization and who is authorized by the organization to conduct a
 marriage ceremony; and
 (4)  a current, former, or retired federal judge or
 state judge [justice of the supreme court, judge of the court of
 criminal appeals, justice of the courts of appeals, judge of the
 district, county, and probate courts, judge of the county courts at
 law, judge of the courts of domestic relations, judge of the
 juvenile courts, retired justice or judge of those courts, justice
 of the peace, retired justice of the peace, judge of a municipal
 court, retired judge of a municipal court, associate judge of a
 statutory probate court, retired associate judge of a statutory
 probate court, associate judge of a county court at law, retired
 associate judge of a county court at law, or judge or magistrate of
 a federal court of this state; and
 [(5)  a retired judge or magistrate of a federal court
 of this state].
 (b)  For the purposes of Subsection (a)(4), "federal judge"
 and "state judge" have the meanings assigned by Section 25.025, Tax
 Code [a retired judge or justice is a former judge or justice who is
 vested in the Judicial Retirement System of Texas Plan One or the
 Judicial Retirement System of Texas Plan Two or who has an aggregate
 of at least 12 years of service as judge or justice of any type
 listed in Subsection (a)(4)].
 SECTION 2.  Section 2.202(b-1), Family Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *