Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2021
Analysis March 16, 2021