Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021