House | 05/08/2021 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/07/2021 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Filed |