Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021