Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4663 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 29, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill May 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 18, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021