1 | | - | H.B. No. 4663 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Martinez, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 4663 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 17, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 17, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Local |
---|
| 4 | + | Government; May 22, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4663 By: Eckhardt |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the powers of the Hidalgo County Drainage District |
---|
6 | 14 | | Number 1; authorizing the issuance of bonds. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. In this Act, "district" means the Hidalgo County |
---|
9 | 17 | | Drainage District Number 1. |
---|
10 | 18 | | SECTION 2. (a) District revenue bonds may be secured as |
---|
11 | 19 | | described by a board resolution by a pledge of: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) all or part of the district's gross revenue, other |
---|
13 | 21 | | than taxation, minus the amount necessary to pay the cost of |
---|
14 | 22 | | maintaining and operating the district and its property; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) the net revenue of a contract made at any time; or |
---|
16 | 24 | | (3) other revenue specified by board resolution. |
---|
17 | 25 | | (b) The pledge may reserve the right to issue additional |
---|
18 | 26 | | bonds on a parity with or subordinate to the bonds being issued, |
---|
19 | 27 | | subject to conditions specified by the pledge. |
---|
20 | 28 | | (c) District revenue bonds not payable wholly or partly from |
---|
21 | 29 | | ad valorem taxes may be issued without an election. |
---|
22 | 30 | | SECTION 3. (a) The district may sell reclaimed water at |
---|
23 | 31 | | wholesale and sell reclaimed water on a retail basis to the extent |
---|
24 | 32 | | that the sale does not conflict with a certificate of convenience |
---|
25 | 33 | | and necessity. |
---|
26 | 34 | | (b) The district may enter into public-private partnership |
---|
27 | 35 | | agreements to fund infrastructure improvements needed to sell |
---|
28 | 36 | | reclaimed water to consumers. |
---|
29 | 37 | | SECTION 4. (a) The legal notice of the intention to |
---|
30 | 38 | | introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this |
---|
31 | 39 | | Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a |
---|
32 | 40 | | copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies, |
---|
33 | 41 | | officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished |
---|
34 | 42 | | under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313, |
---|
35 | 43 | | Government Code. |
---|
36 | 44 | | (b) The governor, one of the required recipients, has |
---|
37 | 45 | | submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on |
---|
38 | 46 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
39 | 47 | | (c) The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed |
---|
40 | 48 | | its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the |
---|
41 | 49 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
42 | 50 | | representatives within the required time. |
---|
43 | 51 | | (d) All requirements of the constitution and laws of this |
---|
44 | 52 | | state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect |
---|
45 | 53 | | to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled |
---|
46 | 54 | | and accomplished. |
---|
47 | 55 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
48 | 56 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
49 | 57 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
50 | 58 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
51 | 59 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
54 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4663 was passed by the House on May |
---|
55 | | - | 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 104, Nays 41, 2 present, not |
---|
56 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
57 | | - | No. 4663 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 98, Nays 44, |
---|
58 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
59 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
60 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
61 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 4663 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
62 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
63 | | - | 0. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
66 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
67 | | - | Date |
---|
68 | | - | __________________ |
---|
69 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 60 | + | * * * * * |
---|