Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 10, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note March 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2021
Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021