Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB492 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 492
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2021;
 May 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 24, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 0;
 May 24, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 492 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a
 no-knock entry by a peace officer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 15, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 15.251 to read as follows:
 Art. 15.251.  NO-KNOCK WARRANT. (a) In this article,
 "no-knock entry" means a peace officer's entry, for the purpose of
 executing a warrant, into a building or other place without giving
 notice of the officer's authority or purpose before entering.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, only the following
 magistrates may issue a warrant under this chapter that authorizes
 a no-knock entry:
 (1)  a district court judge;
 (2)  a statutory county court judge;
 (3)  a judge of a county court who is an attorney
 licensed by this state;
 (4)  a judge of a municipal court of record who is an
 attorney licensed by this state; or
 (5)  any magistrate if the county in which the warrant
 is issued does not have:
 (A)  a municipal court of record with a courtroom
 located in that county and a judge who is an attorney licensed by
 this state;
 (B)  a county court judge who is an attorney
 licensed by this state; or
 (C)  a statutory county court judge.
 (c)  A magistrate may issue a warrant under this chapter that
 authorizes a no-knock entry only if the complaint is submitted
 concurrently with a statement that approves the use of a no-knock
 entry and that is signed by the chief administrator of the law
 enforcement agency employing the affiant or by the chief
 administrator's designee.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 18, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Article 18.025 to read as follows:
 Art. 18.025.  NO-KNOCK WARRANT. (a) In this
 article, "no-knock entry" has the meaning assigned by Article
 15.251.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, only the following
 magistrates may issue a warrant under this chapter that authorizes
 a no-knock entry:
 (1)  a district court judge;
 (2)  a statutory county court judge;
 (3)  a judge of a county court who is an attorney
 licensed by this state;
 (4)  a judge of a municipal court of record who is an
 attorney licensed by this state; or
 (5)  any magistrate if the county in which the warrant
 is issued does not have:
 (A)  a municipal court of record with a courtroom
 located in that county and a judge who is an attorney licensed by
 this state;
 (B)  a county court judge who is an attorney
 licensed by this state; or
 (C)  a statutory county court judge.
 (c)  A magistrate may issue a warrant under this chapter that
 authorizes a no-knock entry only if the affidavit under Article
 18.01(b) is submitted concurrently with a statement that approves
 the use of a no-knock entry and that is signed by the chief
 administrator of the law enforcement agency employing the affiant
 or by the chief administrator's designee.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a warrant issued on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 warrant issued before the effective date of this Act is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the warrant was issued, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *