Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 21, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 21, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021