Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB525 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 525
1+By: Shaheen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 525
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
3+ May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 21, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 21, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the protection of religious organizations.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Subtitle H, Title 10, Government Code, is
814 amended by adding Chapter 2401 to read as follows:
915 CHAPTER 2401. PROTECTION OF RELIGIOUS ORGANIZATIONS
1016 Sec. 2401.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1117 (1) "Disaster" has the meaning assigned by Section
1218 418.004.
1319 (2) "Governmental entity" means:
1420 (A) this state;
1521 (B) a board, commission, council, department, or
1622 other agency in the executive branch of state government that is
1723 created by the state constitution or a statute, including an
1824 institution of higher education as defined by Section 61.003,
1925 Education Code;
2026 (C) the legislature or a legislative agency;
2127 (D) a state judicial agency or the State Bar of
2228 Texas;
2329 (E) a political subdivision of this state,
2430 including a county, municipality, or special district or authority;
2531 or
2632 (F) an officer, employee, or agent of an entity
2733 described by Paragraphs (A) through (E).
2834 (3) "Person" has the meaning assigned by Section
2935 311.005, except the term does not include:
3036 (A) an employee of a governmental entity acting
3137 within the employee's scope of employment; or
3238 (B) a contractor of a governmental entity acting
3339 within the scope of the contract.
3440 (4) "Religious organization" means an organization
3541 open to the public that is a religious organization under Section
3642 110.011(b), Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
3743 Sec. 2401.002. ESSENTIAL BUSINESS; PROHIBITED
3844 RESTRICTIONS. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a religious
3945 organization is an essential business at all times in this state,
4046 including during a declared state of disaster, and the
4147 organization's religious and other related activities are
4248 essential activities even if the activities are not listed as
4349 essential in an order issued during the disaster.
4450 (b) A governmental entity may not:
4551 (1) at any time, including during a declared state of
4652 disaster, prohibit a religious organization from engaging in
4753 religious and other related activities or continuing to operate in
4854 the discharge of the organization's foundational faith-based
4955 mission and purpose; or
5056 (2) during a declared state of disaster order a
5157 religious organization to close or otherwise alter the
5258 organization's purposes or activities.
53- Sec. 2401.003. RELIEF AVAILABLE. (a) A person may assert a
54- violation of Section 2401.002 as a claim or defense in a judicial or
55- administrative proceeding and obtain:
59+ Sec. 2401.003. RELIEF AVAILABLE. (a) A person may assert an
60+ actual or threatened violation of Section 2401.002 as a claim or
61+ defense in a judicial or administrative proceeding and obtain:
5662 (1) injunctive relief;
5763 (2) declaratory relief; and
5864 (3) court costs and reasonable attorney's fees.
5965 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, a person may commence an
6066 action under this section and relief may be granted regardless of
6167 whether the person has sought or exhausted available administrative
6268 remedies.
63- Sec. 2401.004. ATTORNEY GENERAL ACTION; INTERVENTION IN
69+ Sec. 2401.004. IMMUNITY WAIVED. A person who alleges a
70+ violation of Section 2401.002 may sue the governmental entity for
71+ the relief provided under Section 2401.003. Sovereign or
72+ governmental immunity, as applicable, is waived and abolished to
73+ the extent of liability for that relief.
74+ Sec. 2401.005. ATTORNEY GENERAL ACTION; INTERVENTION IN
6475 PROCEEDING; PROHIBITED RECOVERY OF EXPENSES. (a) The attorney
6576 general may bring an action for injunctive or declaratory relief
6677 against a governmental entity or an officer or employee of a
6778 governmental entity to enforce compliance with this chapter.
6879 (b) This section may not be construed to deny, impair, or
6980 otherwise affect any authority of the attorney general or a
7081 governmental entity acting under other law to institute or
7182 intervene in an action.
7283 (c) The attorney general may not recover expenses incurred
7384 in bringing, instituting, or intervening in an action described by
7485 this section.
75- Sec. 2401.005. INTERPRETATION. (a) This chapter may not be
86+ Sec. 2401.006. INTERPRETATION. (a) This chapter may not be
7687 construed to preempt a state or federal law that is equally or more
7788 protective of the free exercise of religious beliefs or to narrow
7889 the meaning or application of a state or federal law protecting the
7990 free exercise of religious beliefs.
8091 (b) This chapter may not be construed to prevent a
8192 governmental entity from providing, either directly or through a
8293 person who is not seeking protection under this chapter, any
8394 benefit or service authorized under state or federal law.
8495 SECTION 2. Chapter 2401, Government Code, as added by this
8596 Act, applies only to a cause of action that accrues on or after the
8697 effective date of this Act. A cause of action that accrued before
8798 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
8899 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
89100 continued in effect for that purpose.
90101 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
91102 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
92103 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
93104 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
94105 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
95- ______________________________ ______________________________
96- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
97- I certify that H.B. No. 525 was passed by the House on May 13,
98- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 98, Nays 44, 2 present, not
99- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
100- No. 525 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 10,
101- 1 present, not voting.
102- ______________________________
103- Chief Clerk of the House
104- I certify that H.B. No. 525 was passed by the Senate, with
105- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays
106- 3.
107- ______________________________
108- Secretary of the Senate
109- APPROVED: __________________
110- Date
111- __________________
112- Governor
106+ * * * * *