Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021