|
06/18/2021
|
Effective on 9/1/21
|
|
|
|
06/18/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Record vote RV#1556
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#1028
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Record vote RV#1003
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 7-Canales
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Record vote RV#1002
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 5-K. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amendment amended 6-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 5-K. King, Bailes, Frullo, Price, Kuempel, and Larson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 4-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Record vote RV#1001
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-E. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 2-Romero and J.D. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Amended 1-Vasut
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(b)(10)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|