Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB547 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 547
1+By: Frank, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 547
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2021;
3+ May 14, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 19, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 3;
6+ May 19, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 547 By: Paxton
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to authorizing equal opportunity for access by
614 non-enrolled students to University Interscholastic League
715 sponsored activities; authorizing a fee.
816 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
917 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
1018 amended by adding Section 33.0832 to read as follows:
1119 Sec. 33.0832. EQUAL OPPORTUNITY FOR CERTAIN STUDENTS TO
1220 PARTICIPATE IN UNIVERSITY INTERSCHOLASTIC LEAGUE ACTIVITIES. (a)
1321 In this section:
1422 (1) "League" means the University Interscholastic
1523 League.
1624 (2) "Non-enrolled student" means a student who
1725 receives instruction as described by Section 29.916(a)(1) from a
1826 nonpublic school.
1927 (b) Nothing in this section may be construed to affect the
2028 holding in Texas Educ. Agency v. Leeper, 893 S.W.2d 432 (Tex. 1994),
2129 classifying home schools as private schools. The legislature finds
2230 that a home school is a private school for purposes of this section.
2331 (c) Except as provided by Subsection (i), a public school
2432 that participates in an activity sponsored by the league may
2533 provide a non-enrolled student, who otherwise meets league
2634 eligibility standards to represent that school in a league
2735 activity, with the opportunity to participate in the activity on
2836 behalf of the school in the same manner that the school provides the
2937 opportunity to participate to students enrolled in the school.
3038 (d) A non-enrolled student who seeks to participate or
3139 participates in a league activity on behalf of a school is subject
3240 to the following relevant policies that apply to students enrolled
3341 in the school:
3442 (1) registration for league activities;
3543 (2) age eligibility;
3644 (3) fees;
3745 (4) insurance;
3846 (5) transportation;
3947 (6) physical condition;
4048 (7) qualifications;
4149 (8) responsibilities;
4250 (9) event schedules;
4351 (10) standards of behavior; and
4452 (11) performance.
4553 (e) A non-enrolled student may only participate in a league
4654 activity for the school in the school district that the student
4755 would be eligible to attend based on the student's residential
4856 address. A non-enrolled student who seeks to participate in a
4957 league activity on behalf of a school shall be required to establish
5058 minimum proof of residency acceptable to the district in the same
5159 manner as an applicant to attend a school in the district under
5260 Section 25.001.
5361 (f) The parent or person standing in parental relation to a
5462 non-enrolled student is responsible for oversight of academic
5563 standards relating to the student's participation in a league
5664 activity. As a condition of eligibility to participate in a league
5765 activity during the first six weeks of a school year, a non-enrolled
5866 student must demonstrate grade-level academic proficiency on any
5967 nationally recognized, norm-referenced assessment instrument, such
6068 as the Iowa Test of Basic Skills, Stanford Achievement Test,
6169 California Achievement Test, or Comprehensive Test of Basic Skills.
6270 A non-enrolled student demonstrates the required academic
6371 proficiency by achieving a composite, core, or survey score that is
6472 within the average or higher than average range of scores, as
6573 established by the applicable testing service. For purposes of
6674 this subsection, a school district shall accept assessment results
6775 administered or reported by a third party.
6876 (g) A non-enrolled student's demonstration of academic
6977 proficiency under Subsection (f) is sufficient for purposes of that
7078 subsection for the school year in which the student achieves the
7179 required score and the subsequent school year.
7280 (h) After the first six weeks of a school year, the parent or
7381 person standing in parental relation to a non-enrolled student
7482 participating in a league activity on behalf of a public school must
7583 periodically, in accordance with the school's grading calendar,
7684 provide written verification to the school indicating that the
7785 student is receiving a passing grade in each course or subject being
7886 taught.
7987 (i) A non-enrolled student is not authorized by this section
8088 to participate in a league activity during the remainder of any
8189 school year during which the student was previously enrolled in a
8290 public school.
8391 (j) The league may not prohibit a non-enrolled student from
8492 participating in league activities in the manner authorized by this
8593 section.
8694 (k) With respect to a non-enrolled student's education
8795 program, nothing in this section shall be construed to permit an
8896 agency of this state, a public school district, or any other
8997 governmental body to exercise control, regulatory authority, or
9098 supervision over a non-enrolled student or a parent or person
9199 standing in parental relation to a non-enrolled student beyond the
92100 control, regulatory authority, or supervision required to
93101 participate in a league activity.
94102 (l) Subject only to eligibility requirements under this
95103 section for a non-enrolled student to participate in a league
96104 activity:
97105 (1) the curriculum or assessment requirements,
98106 performance standards, practices, or creed of the education program
99107 provided to a non-enrolled student may not be required to be changed
100108 in order for the non-enrolled student to participate in a league
101109 activity; and
102110 (2) for a non-enrolled student participating in an
103111 education program on January 1, 2021, the education program
104112 provided to that student may not be required to comply with any
105113 state law or agency rule relating to that education program unless
106114 the law or rule was in effect on January 1, 2021.
107115 (m) Notwithstanding any other law, a non-enrolled student
108116 who participates in a league activity under this section is subject
109117 to the immunization requirements and exceptions of Section 38.001
110118 in the same manner as a public school student.
111119 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2021-2022
112120 school year.
113121 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
114122 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
115123 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
116124 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
117125 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
118- ______________________________ ______________________________
119- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
120- I certify that H.B. No. 547 was passed by the House on May 13,
121- 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 80, Nays 64, 1 present, not
122- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
123- No. 547 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 80, Nays 63, 1
124- present, not voting.
125- ______________________________
126- Chief Clerk of the House
127- I certify that H.B. No. 547 was passed by the Senate, with
128- amendments, on May 22, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 16, Nays
129- 14.
130- ______________________________
131- Secretary of the Senate
132- APPROVED: __________________
133- Date
134- __________________
135- Governor
126+ * * * * *