Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2020

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 8, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis May 7, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021