Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB549 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 549
1+By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 549
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
3+ May 6, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 17, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 17, 2021, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 549 By: Seliger
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to exemptions from liability for certain professionals for
614 the disclosure of certain mental health information.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. Section 611.002, Health and Safety Code, is
917 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
1018 read as follows:
1119 (b) Confidential communications or records may not be
1220 disclosed except as provided by Section 611.004, 611.0041, or
1321 611.0045.
1422 (b-1) No exception to the privilege of confidentiality
1523 under Section 611.004 may be construed to create an independent
1624 duty or requirement to disclose the confidential information to
1725 which the exception applies.
1826 SECTION 2. Section 611.004, Health and Safety Code, is
1927 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
2028 read as follows:
2129 (a) A professional may disclose confidential information
2230 only:
2331 (1) to a governmental agency if the disclosure is
2432 required or authorized by law;
2533 (2) to medical, mental health, or law enforcement
2634 personnel if the professional determines that there is a
2735 probability of imminent physical injury by the patient to the
2836 patient or others or there is a probability of immediate mental or
2937 emotional injury to the patient;
3038 (3) to qualified personnel for management audits,
3139 financial audits, program evaluations, or research, in accordance
3240 with Subsection (b);
3341 (4) to a person who has the written consent of the
3442 patient, or a parent if the patient is a minor, or a guardian if the
3543 patient has been adjudicated as incompetent to manage the patient's
3644 personal affairs;
3745 (5) to the patient's personal representative if the
3846 patient is deceased;
3947 (6) to individuals, corporations, or governmental
4048 agencies involved in paying or collecting fees for mental or
4149 emotional health services provided by a professional;
4250 (7) to other professionals and personnel under the
4351 professionals' direction who participate in the diagnosis,
4452 evaluation, or treatment of the patient;
4553 (8) in an official legislative inquiry relating to a
4654 state hospital or state school as provided by Subsection (c);
4755 (9) to designated persons or personnel of a
4856 correctional facility in which a person is detained if the
4957 disclosure is for the sole purpose of providing treatment and
5058 health care to the person in custody;
5159 (10) to an employee or agent of the professional who
5260 requires mental health care information to provide mental health
5361 care services or in complying with statutory, licensing, or
5462 accreditation requirements, if the professional has taken
5563 appropriate action to ensure that the employee or agent:
5664 (A) will not use or disclose the information for
5765 any other purposes; and
5866 (B) will take appropriate steps to protect the
5967 information; or
6068 (11) to satisfy a request for medical records of a
6169 deceased or incompetent person pursuant to Section 74.051(e), Civil
6270 Practice and Remedies Code.
6371 (a-1) No civil, criminal, or administrative cause of action
6472 exists against a person described by Section 611.001(2)(A) or (B)
6573 for the disclosure of confidential information in accordance with
6674 Subsection (a)(2). A cause of action brought against the person for
6775 the disclosure of the confidential information must be dismissed
6876 with prejudice.
6977 SECTION 3. Section 159.002, Occupations Code, is amended by
7078 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
7179 (c-1) No exception to the privilege of confidentiality
7280 under Section 159.003 or 159.004 may be construed to create an
7381 independent duty or requirement to disclose the confidential
7482 information to which the exception applies.
7583 SECTION 4. Section 159.004, Occupations Code, is amended to
7684 read as follows:
7785 Sec. 159.004. EXCEPTIONS TO CONFIDENTIALITY IN OTHER
7886 SITUATIONS. (a) An exception to the privilege of confidentiality
7987 in a situation other than a court or administrative proceeding,
8088 allowing disclosure of confidential information by a physician,
8189 exists only with respect to the following:
8290 (1) a governmental agency, if the disclosure is
8391 required or authorized by law;
8492 (2) medical, mental health, or law enforcement
8593 personnel, if the physician determines that there is a probability
8694 of:
8795 (A) imminent physical injury to the patient, the
8896 physician, or another person; or
8997 (B) immediate mental or emotional injury to the
9098 patient;
9199 (3) qualified personnel for research or for a
92100 management audit, financial audit, or program evaluation, but the
93101 personnel may not directly or indirectly identify a patient in any
94102 report of the research, audit, or evaluation or otherwise disclose
95103 identity in any manner;
96104 (4) those parts of the medical records reflecting
97105 specific services provided if necessary in the collection of fees
98106 for medical services provided by a physician, professional
99107 association, or other entity qualified to provide or arrange for
100108 medical services;
101109 (5) a person who has consent, as provided by Section
102110 159.005;
103111 (6) a person, corporation, or governmental agency
104112 involved in the payment or collection of fees for medical services
105113 provided by a physician;
106114 (7) another physician or other personnel acting under
107115 the direction of the physician who participate in the diagnosis,
108116 evaluation, or treatment of the patient;
109117 (8) an official legislative inquiry regarding state
110118 hospitals or state schools, if:
111119 (A) information or a record that identifies a
112120 patient or client is not released for any purpose unless proper
113121 consent to the release is given by the patient; and
114122 (B) only records created by the state hospital or
115123 school or its employees are included; or
116124 (9) health care personnel of a penal or other
117125 custodial institution in which the patient is detained if the
118126 disclosure is for the sole purpose of providing health care to the
119127 patient.
120128 (b) No civil, criminal, or administrative cause of action
121129 exists against a physician for the disclosure of confidential
122130 information in accordance with Subsection (a)(2). A cause of
123131 action brought against a physician for the disclosure of the
124132 confidential information must be dismissed with prejudice.
125133 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
126134 a disclosure of confidential information made on or after the
127135 effective date of this Act. A disclosure made before the effective
128136 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
129137 disclosure was made, and that law is continued in effect for that
130138 purpose.
131139 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
132- ______________________________ ______________________________
133- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
134- I certify that H.B. No. 549 was passed by the House on April
135- 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 28, 2 present, not
136- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
137- No. 549 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, 1
138- present, not voting.
139- ______________________________
140- Chief Clerk of the House
141- I certify that H.B. No. 549 was passed by the Senate, with
142- amendments, on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
143- 1.
144- ______________________________
145- Secretary of the Senate
146- APPROVED: __________________
147- Date
148- __________________
149- Governor
140+ * * * * *