Senate | 05/04/2021 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Record vote RV#370 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Passed | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Amended 1-Canales | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 11/13/2020 | Filed |