Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 13, 2021