Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021