Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB569 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 569
1+By: Sanford, et al. (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 569
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2021;
3+ April 19, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Criminal Justice; May 6, 2021, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2021, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to credit toward payment of a fine and costs for certain
612 misdemeanants confined in jail or prison before sentencing.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
8- SECTION 1. This Act may be cited as the Bonton Farms Act.
9- SECTION 2. Article 45.014(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
14+ SECTION 1. Article 45.014(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
1015 as added by Chapter 1127 (S.B. 1913), Acts of the 85th Legislature,
1116 Regular Session, 2017, is amended to read as follows:
1217 (e) A justice or judge may not issue an arrest warrant for
1318 the defendant's failure to appear at the initial court setting,
1419 including failure to appear as required by a citation issued under
1520 Article 14.06(b), unless:
1621 (1) the justice or judge provides by telephone or
1722 regular mail to the defendant notice that includes:
1823 (A) a date and time, occurring within the 30-day
1924 period following the date that notice is provided, when the
2025 defendant must appear before the justice or judge;
2126 (B) the name and address of the court with
2227 jurisdiction in the case;
2328 (C) information regarding alternatives to the
2429 full payment of any fine or costs owed by the defendant, if the
2530 defendant is unable to pay that amount;
2631 (D) a statement that the defendant may be
2732 entitled to a credit toward any fine or costs owed by the defendant
2833 if the defendant was confined in jail or prison after the commission
2934 of the offense for which the notice is given; and
3035 (E) [(D)] an explanation of the consequences if
3136 the defendant fails to appear before the justice or judge as
3237 required by this article; and
3338 (2) the defendant fails to appear before the justice
3439 or judge as required by this article.
35- SECTION 3. Article 45.041, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
40+ SECTION 2. Article 45.041, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
3641 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
3742 read as follows:
3843 (c) The justice or judge shall credit the defendant for time
3944 served in jail as provided by Article 42.03. The credit under this
4045 subsection shall be applied to the amount of the fine and costs at
4146 the rate provided by Article 45.048.
4247 (c-1) In addition to credit under Subsection (c), in
4348 imposing a fine and costs in a case involving a misdemeanor
4449 punishable by a fine only, the justice or judge shall credit the
4550 defendant for any time the defendant was confined in jail or prison
4651 while serving a sentence for another offense if that confinement
4752 occurred after the commission of the misdemeanor. The credit under
4853 this subsection shall be applied to the amount of the fine and costs
4954 at the rate of not less than $150 for each day of confinement.
50- SECTION 4. Article 45.048, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
55+ SECTION 3. Article 45.048, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
5156 amended to read as follows:
5257 Art. 45.048. DISCHARGED FROM JAIL. (a) A defendant placed
5358 in jail on account of failure to pay the fine and costs shall be
5459 discharged on habeas corpus by showing that the defendant:
5560 (1) is too poor to pay the fine and costs; or
5661 (2) has remained in jail a sufficient length of time to
5762 satisfy the fine and costs, at the rate of not less than $150 [$100]
5863 for each period served, as specified by the convicting court in the
5964 judgment in the case.
6065 (b) A convicting court may specify a period that is not less
6166 than eight hours or more than 24 hours as the period for which a
6267 defendant who fails to pay the fine and costs in the case must
6368 remain in jail to satisfy $150 [$100] of the fine and costs.
64- SECTION 5. Article 45.014(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
69+ SECTION 4. Article 45.014(e), Code of Criminal Procedure,
6570 as added by Chapter 977 (H.B. 351), Acts of the 85th Legislature,
6671 Regular Session, 2017, is repealed.
67- SECTION 6. Article 45.041(c-1), Code of Criminal Procedure,
72+ SECTION 5. Article 45.041(c-1), Code of Criminal Procedure,
6873 as added by this Act, applies to a defendant who is sentenced for an
6974 offense on or after the effective date of this Act, regardless of
7075 whether the offense is committed before, on, or after the effective
7176 date of this Act.
72- SECTION 7. Article 45.048, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
77+ SECTION 6. Article 45.048, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
7378 amended by this Act, applies to a defendant who is placed in jail on
7479 or after the effective date of this Act for failure to pay the fine
7580 and costs imposed on conviction of an offense, regardless of
7681 whether the offense for which the defendant was convicted was
7782 committed before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
78- SECTION 8. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
79- ______________________________ ______________________________
80- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
81- I certify that H.B. No. 569 was passed by the House on April
82- 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 1, 1 present, not
83- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
84- No. 569 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1
85- present, not voting.
86- ______________________________
87- Chief Clerk of the House
88- I certify that H.B. No. 569 was passed by the Senate, with
89- amendments, on May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
90- 0.
91- ______________________________
92- Secretary of the Senate
93- APPROVED: __________________
94- Date
95- __________________
96- Governor
83+ SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
84+ * * * * *