Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 13, 2020

Engrossed

Bill May 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 30, 2021
Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill April 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021