11 | | - | SECTION 1. Section 29.081(d), Education Code, as amended by |
---|
12 | | - | Chapters 403 (S.B. 1746), 597 (S.B. 668), and 1060 (H.B. 1051), Acts |
---|
13 | | - | of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is reenacted and |
---|
14 | | - | amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | | - | (d) For purposes of this section, "student at risk of |
---|
16 | | - | dropping out of school" includes each student who: |
---|
17 | | - | (1) is under 26 years of age and who: |
---|
18 | | - | (A) was not advanced from one grade level to the |
---|
19 | | - | next for one or more school years; |
---|
20 | | - | (B) if the student is in grade 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, or |
---|
21 | | - | 12, did not maintain an average equivalent to 70 on a scale of 100 in |
---|
22 | | - | two or more subjects in the foundation curriculum during a semester |
---|
23 | | - | in the preceding or current school year or is not maintaining such |
---|
24 | | - | an average in two or more subjects in the foundation curriculum in |
---|
25 | | - | the current semester; |
---|
26 | | - | (C) did not perform satisfactorily on an |
---|
27 | | - | assessment instrument administered to the student under Subchapter |
---|
28 | | - | B, Chapter 39, and who has not in the previous or current school |
---|
29 | | - | year subsequently performed on that instrument or another |
---|
30 | | - | appropriate instrument at a level equal to at least 110 percent of |
---|
31 | | - | the level of satisfactory performance on that instrument; |
---|
32 | | - | (D) if the student is in prekindergarten, |
---|
33 | | - | kindergarten, or grade 1, 2, or 3, did not perform satisfactorily on |
---|
34 | | - | a readiness test or assessment instrument administered during the |
---|
35 | | - | current school year; |
---|
36 | | - | (E) is pregnant or is a parent; |
---|
37 | | - | (F) has been placed in an alternative education |
---|
38 | | - | program in accordance with Section 37.006 during the preceding or |
---|
39 | | - | current school year; |
---|
40 | | - | (G) has been expelled in accordance with Section |
---|
41 | | - | 37.007 during the preceding or current school year; |
---|
42 | | - | (H) is currently on parole, probation, deferred |
---|
43 | | - | prosecution, or other conditional release; |
---|
44 | | - | (I) was previously reported through the Public |
---|
45 | | - | Education Information Management System (PEIMS) to have dropped out |
---|
46 | | - | of school; |
---|
47 | | - | (J) is a student of limited English proficiency, |
---|
48 | | - | as defined by Section 29.052; |
---|
49 | | - | (K) is in the custody or care of the Department of |
---|
50 | | - | Family and Protective Services or has, during the current school |
---|
51 | | - | year, been referred to the department by a school official, officer |
---|
52 | | - | of the juvenile court, or law enforcement official; |
---|
53 | | - | (L) is homeless; |
---|
54 | | - | (M) resided in the preceding school year or |
---|
55 | | - | resides in the current school year in a residential placement |
---|
56 | | - | facility in the district, including a detention facility, substance |
---|
57 | | - | abuse treatment facility, emergency shelter, psychiatric hospital, |
---|
58 | | - | halfway house, cottage home operation, specialized child-care |
---|
59 | | - | home, or general residential operation; [or] |
---|
60 | | - | (N) [(14)] has been incarcerated or has a parent |
---|
61 | | - | or guardian who has been incarcerated, within the lifetime of the |
---|
62 | | - | student, in a penal institution as defined by Section 1.07, Penal |
---|
63 | | - | Code; or |
---|
64 | | - | (O) is enrolled in a school district or |
---|
65 | | - | open-enrollment charter school, or a campus of a school district or |
---|
66 | | - | open-enrollment charter school, that is designated as a dropout |
---|
67 | | - | recovery school under Section 39.0548; or |
---|
68 | | - | (2) regardless of the student's age, participates in |
---|
69 | | - | an adult education program provided under a high school diploma and |
---|
70 | | - | industry certification charter school program under Section |
---|
71 | | - | 29.259. |
---|
72 | | - | SECTION 2. Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is |
---|
| 16 | + | SECTION 1. Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is |
---|
73 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 29.928 to read as follows: |
---|
74 | 18 | | Sec. 29.928. STUDY ON COMPETENCY-BASED EDUCATIONAL |
---|
75 | 19 | | PROGRAMS. (a) The agency shall conduct a study on the |
---|
76 | 20 | | implementation of competency-based educational programs by public |
---|
77 | 21 | | schools in the state. |
---|
78 | 22 | | (b) The study must analyze methods of: |
---|
79 | 23 | | (1) providing funding for competency-based |
---|
80 | 24 | | educational programs that do not rely on average daily attendance; |
---|
81 | 25 | | (2) assessing the performance of competency-based |
---|
82 | 26 | | educational programs under the public school accountability |
---|
83 | 27 | | system; and |
---|
84 | 28 | | (3) providing competency-based educational programs |
---|
85 | 29 | | to nontraditional students, including adult students. |
---|
86 | 30 | | (c) The agency may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and |
---|
87 | 31 | | donations from any public or private source to fund the study. |
---|
88 | 32 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2022, the agency shall |
---|
89 | 33 | | prepare and submit to the legislature a report on the results of the |
---|
90 | 34 | | study and any recommendations for legislative or other action. |
---|
91 | 35 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
92 | | - | SECTION 3. The Texas Education Agency is required to |
---|
93 | | - | implement Section 29.928, Education Code, as added by this Act, |
---|
94 | | - | only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that |
---|
95 | | - | purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money |
---|
96 | | - | specifically for that purpose, the agency may, but is not required |
---|
97 | | - | to, implement that section using other money available for that |
---|
98 | | - | purpose. |
---|
99 | | - | SECTION 4. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails |
---|
100 | | - | over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, |
---|
101 | | - | relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted |
---|
102 | | - | codes. |
---|
103 | | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
| 36 | + | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
108 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
109 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
110 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 572 was passed by the House on May 14, |
---|
111 | | - | 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 128, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
112 | | - | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
113 | | - | H.B. No. 572 on May 28, 2021, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
114 | | - | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
115 | | - | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
116 | | - | on H.B. No. 572 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138, |
---|
117 | | - | Nays 0, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
118 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
119 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
120 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 572 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
121 | | - | amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
122 | | - | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
123 | | - | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
124 | | - | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
125 | | - | 572 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
126 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
127 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
128 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
129 | | - | Date |
---|
130 | | - | __________________ |
---|
131 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 41 | + | * * * * * |
---|