Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB574 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/05/2021

                    By: Bonnen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 574
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021;
 April 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 5, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 5, 2021, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 574 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of criminal offenses involving elections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 276, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Section 276.014 to read as follows:
 Sec. 276.014.  OTHER ELECTION OFFENSES.  (a)  A person
 commits an offense if the person knowingly or intentionally makes
 any effort to:
 (1)  count votes the person knows are invalid or alter a
 report to include votes the person knows are invalid; or
 (2)  refuse to count valid votes or alter a report to
 exclude valid votes.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a felony of the second
 degree.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *