Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB574 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 16, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 4, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021