1 | | - | H.B. No. 574 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Bonnen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 574 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 21, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 5, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 5 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; May 5, 2021, sent |
---|
| 6 | + | to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 574 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the creation of criminal offenses involving elections. |
---|
6 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 276, Election Code, is amended by adding |
---|
8 | 15 | | Section 276.014 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 16 | | Sec. 276.014. OTHER ELECTION OFFENSES. (a) A person |
---|
10 | 17 | | commits an offense if the person knowingly or intentionally makes |
---|
11 | 18 | | any effort to: |
---|
12 | 19 | | (1) count votes the person knows are invalid or alter a |
---|
13 | 20 | | report to include votes the person knows are invalid; or |
---|
19 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
20 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
21 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 574 was passed by the House on April |
---|
22 | | - | 16, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 95, Nays 49, 1 present, not |
---|
23 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
24 | | - | No. 574 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 94, Nays 48, 1 |
---|
25 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
26 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
27 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
28 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 574 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
29 | | - | amendments, on May 12, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 21, Nays |
---|
30 | | - | 9. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
33 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Date |
---|
35 | | - | __________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 26 | + | * * * * * |
---|