Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 20, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 22, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis April 8, 2021