1 | | - | H.B. No. 619 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 619 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2021; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 5 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 22, 2021, reported |
---|
| 6 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 7 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 619 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to developing a strategic plan to support the child-care |
---|
6 | 15 | | workforce. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 302, Labor Code, is |
---|
9 | 18 | | amended by adding Section 302.0062 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 302.0062. STRATEGIC PLAN TO SUPPORT CHILD-CARE |
---|
11 | 20 | | WORKFORCE. (a) The commission shall prepare a strategic plan for |
---|
12 | 21 | | improving the quality of the infant, toddler, preschool, and |
---|
13 | 22 | | school-age child-care workforce in this state. The strategic plan |
---|
14 | 23 | | must include: |
---|
15 | 24 | | (1) recommendations for local workforce development |
---|
16 | 25 | | boards to improve, sustain, and support the child-care workforce; |
---|
17 | 26 | | (2) recommendations for increasing compensation for |
---|
18 | 27 | | and reducing turnover of child-care workers; |
---|
19 | 28 | | (3) recommendations for eliminating pay disparities |
---|
20 | 29 | | in the child-care workforce; |
---|
21 | 30 | | (4) recommendations for increasing paid opportunities |
---|
22 | 31 | | for professional development and education for child-care workers, |
---|
23 | 32 | | including apprenticeships; |
---|
24 | 33 | | (5) best practices from local workforce development |
---|
25 | 34 | | boards in this state and other programs designed to support |
---|
26 | 35 | | child-care workers; |
---|
27 | 36 | | (6) recommendations for increasing participation in |
---|
28 | 37 | | the Texas Early Childhood Professional Development System; |
---|
29 | 38 | | (7) recommendations for public and private |
---|
30 | 39 | | institutions of higher education to: |
---|
31 | 40 | | (A) increase the use of articulation agreements |
---|
32 | 41 | | with school districts and open-enrollment charter schools; and |
---|
33 | 42 | | (B) assist in the education and training of |
---|
34 | 43 | | child-care workers; |
---|
35 | 44 | | (8) specific recommendations for improving the infant |
---|
36 | 45 | | and toddler child-care workforce; and |
---|
37 | 46 | | (9) a timeline and benchmarks for the commission and |
---|
38 | 47 | | local workforce development boards to implement recommendations |
---|
39 | 48 | | from the strategic plan. |
---|
40 | 49 | | (b) The commission shall convene a workgroup to assist the |
---|
41 | 50 | | commission in developing the plan. The workgroup shall include: |
---|
42 | 51 | | (1) child-care providers; |
---|
43 | 52 | | (2) community stakeholders; and |
---|
44 | 53 | | (3) child-care workers. |
---|
45 | 54 | | (c) The commission shall use the following information in |
---|
46 | 55 | | creating the plan: |
---|
47 | 56 | | (1) demographic data of child-care workers in this |
---|
48 | 57 | | state, including: |
---|
49 | 58 | | (A) the race, ethnicity, gender, and educational |
---|
50 | 59 | | attainment of child-care workers; and |
---|
51 | 60 | | (B) the ages of the children the worker serves; |
---|
52 | 61 | | (2) compensation data for child-care workers |
---|
53 | 62 | | disaggregated by race, ethnicity, gender, and educational |
---|
54 | 63 | | attainment; |
---|
55 | 64 | | (3) the information described by Subdivisions (1) and |
---|
56 | 65 | | (2) for a representative sample set of child-care facilities in the |
---|
57 | 66 | | state; and |
---|
58 | 67 | | (4) information provided by the workgroup established |
---|
59 | 68 | | under Subsection (b). |
---|
60 | 69 | | (d) The commission shall provide the strategic plan |
---|
61 | 70 | | prepared under this section to the governor, the lieutenant |
---|
62 | 71 | | governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives. |
---|
63 | 72 | | (e) The commission shall update the strategic plan prepared |
---|
64 | 73 | | under this section every three years. |
---|
65 | 74 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 31, 2022, the Texas |
---|
66 | 75 | | Workforce Commission shall make the strategic plan required by |
---|
67 | 76 | | Section 302.0062, Labor Code, as added by this Act, available to the |
---|
68 | 77 | | governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
69 | 78 | | representatives. |
---|
70 | 79 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
73 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 619 was passed by the House on April |
---|
74 | | - | 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 91, Nays 54, 1 present, not |
---|
75 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
76 | | - | No. 619 on May 28, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 95, Nays 47, 2 |
---|
77 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
78 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
80 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 619 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
81 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays |
---|
82 | | - | 5. |
---|
83 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
85 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
86 | | - | Date |
---|
87 | | - | __________________ |
---|
88 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 80 | + | * * * * * |
---|