Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB626 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 626
1+By: Rosenthal, Tinderholt H.B. No. 626
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2021;
4+ April 13, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Veteran Affairs & Border Security; April 23, 2021, reported
6+ adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
7+ vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 626 By: Taylor
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the expansion of the Texas Innovative Adult Career
615 Education (ACE) Grant Program to include certain nonprofit
716 organizations providing job training to veterans.
817 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
918 SECTION 1. Section 136.001, Education Code, is amended by
1019 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
1120 (5) "Veteran" means a person who has served in:
1221 (A) the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
1322 marine corps of the United States;
1423 (B) the state military forces as defined by
1524 Section 431.001, Government Code, other than the Texas State Guard;
1625 or
1726 (C) an auxiliary service of one of those branches
1827 of the armed forces.
1928 SECTION 2. Section 136.005, Education Code, is amended to
2029 read as follows:
2130 Sec. 136.005. TEXAS INNOVATIVE ADULT CAREER EDUCATION (ACE)
2231 GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The grant administrator shall establish and
2332 administer the Texas Innovative Adult Career Education (ACE) Grant
2433 Program to provide grants to:
2534 (1) eligible nonprofit workforce intermediary and job
2635 training organizations; and
2736 (2) eligible nonprofit organizations providing job
2837 training to veterans.
2938 (a-1) In awarding grants under the program, the grant
3039 administrator shall take into consideration the recommendations of
3140 the program advisory board.
3241 (b) Grants may be awarded under this chapter from the Texas
3342 Innovative Adult Career Education (ACE) Grant fund only to develop,
3443 support, or expand programs of eligible nonprofit workforce
3544 intermediary and job training organizations and of eligible
3645 nonprofit organizations providing job training to veterans to
3746 prepare low-income students or veterans, as applicable, to enter
3847 careers in high-demand and significantly higher-earning
3948 occupations.
4049 SECTION 3. Section 136.006, Education Code, is amended by
4150 adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
4251 follows:
4352 (a-1) To be eligible for a grant under the program, a
4453 nonprofit organization providing job training services to veterans
4554 must:
4655 (1) apply to the grant administrator in the manner
4756 prescribed by the grant administrator;
4857 (2) provide to veterans, in partnership with public
4958 junior colleges, public state colleges, or public technical
5059 institutes:
5160 (A) job training; and
5261 (B) a continuum of services designed to move a
5362 program participant from application to employment, including
5463 outreach, assessment, case management, support services, and
5564 career placement;
5665 (3) be governed by a board or other governing
5766 structure that includes recognized leaders of broad-based
5867 community organizations and executive-level or managerial-level
5968 members of the local business community;
6069 (4) demonstrate to the satisfaction of the program
6170 advisory board that the organization's program has achieved or will
6271 achieve the following measures of success among program
6372 participants:
6473 (A) the measures prescribed by Subsections
6574 (a)(4)(A)-(C);
6675 (B) rapid attainment of civilian workforce
6776 credentials; and
6877 (C) entry into careers with significantly higher
6978 earnings for program participants than previously achieved; and
7079 (5) provide matching funds in accordance with rules
7180 adopted under this chapter.
7281 (b) The matching funds required under Subsection (a)(5) or
7382 (a-1)(5) may be obtained from any source available to the
7483 organization, including in-kind contributions, community or
7584 foundation grants, individual contributions, and local
7685 governmental agency operating funds. The grant administrator may
7786 adopt rules requiring an organization to demonstrate compliance
7887 with the matching funds requirement before the payment of the next
7988 installment under an awarded grant.
8089 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
81- ______________________________ ______________________________
82- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
83- I certify that H.B. No. 626 was passed by the House on April
84- 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
85- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
86- No. 626 on May 3, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1
87- present, not voting.
88- ______________________________
89- Chief Clerk of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 626 was passed by the Senate, with
91- amendments, on April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31,
92- Nays 0.
93- ______________________________
94- Secretary of the Senate
95- APPROVED: __________________
96- Date
97- __________________
98- Governor
90+ * * * * *