Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021
Bill March 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021
Analysis March 30, 2021