|
05/26/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
05/26/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/14/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Record vote RV#187
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#178
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#177
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 3-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Record vote RV#176
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amendment amended 4-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 3-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended 2-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Amended 1-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
11/24/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|