Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 24, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021