Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB654 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 24, 2020

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 20, 2021
Fiscal Note March 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2021
Bill March 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021