1 | | - | H.B. No. 654 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lucio III, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 654 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2021; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 8, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Jurisprudence; April 23, 2021, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 3, Nays 2; April 23, 2021, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the rule against perpetuities. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 112.036, Property Code, is amended to |
---|
8 | 14 | | read as follows: |
---|
9 | 15 | | Sec. 112.036. RULE AGAINST PERPETUITIES. (a) The rule |
---|
10 | 16 | | against perpetuities applies to an interest in a trust [trusts] |
---|
11 | 17 | | other than a charitable trust [trusts]. |
---|
12 | 18 | | (b) For purposes of this section, the effective date of a |
---|
13 | 19 | | trust is the date the trust becomes irrevocable. |
---|
14 | 20 | | (c) An interest in a trust must vest, if at all: |
---|
15 | 21 | | (1) not later than 300 years after the effective date |
---|
16 | 22 | | of the trust, if the effective date of the trust is on or after |
---|
17 | 23 | | September 1, 2021; or |
---|
18 | 24 | | (2) except as provided by Subsection (d), |
---|
19 | 25 | | [Accordingly, an interest is not good unless it must vest, if at |
---|
20 | 26 | | all,] not later than 21 years after some life in being at the time of |
---|
21 | 27 | | the creation of the interest, plus a period of gestation, if the |
---|
22 | 28 | | effective date of the trust is before September 1, 2021. |
---|
23 | 29 | | (d) An interest in a trust that has an effective date before |
---|
24 | 30 | | September 1, 2021, may vest as described by Subsection (c)(1) if the |
---|
25 | 31 | | trust instrument provides that an interest in the trust vests under |
---|
26 | 32 | | the provisions of this section applicable to trusts on the date that |
---|
27 | 33 | | the interest vests. |
---|
28 | 34 | | (e) Any interest in a trust may[, however,] be reformed or |
---|
29 | 35 | | construed to the extent and as provided by Section 5.043. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 654 was passed by the House on April |
---|
37 | | - | 1, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
39 | | - | No. 654 on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 8, 1 |
---|
40 | | - | present, not voting. |
---|
41 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
42 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
43 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 654 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
44 | | - | amendments, on May 10, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 19, Nays |
---|
45 | | - | 9, 2 present, not voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Date |
---|
50 | | - | __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 37 | + | * * * * * |
---|