Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB671 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2020

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021