|
06/18/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2021
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#1738
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2021
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion prevails
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2021
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Postponed 5/24/21 11:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Whitmire
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2021
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Record vote RV#109
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Record vote RV#100
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Amended 2-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Amended 1-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2020
|
Filed
|
|
|