Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas House Bill HB686 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 686
1+By: Moody, et al. H.B. No. 686
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Lucio, Eckhardt, Hall)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 8, 2021;
4+ May 10, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
5+ Justice; May 20, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
7+ May 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 686 By: Whitmire
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the release on parole of certain youthful offenders;
615 changing parole eligibility.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 508, Government Code, is
918 amended by adding Section 508.1415 to read as follows:
1019 Sec. 508.1415. ADDITIONAL PAROLE CONSIDERATIONS FOR
1120 YOUTHFUL OFFENDERS. (a) This section applies only to the
1221 consideration for release on parole of an inmate who was younger
1322 than 17 years of age at the time the offense for which the inmate is
1423 eligible for release on parole was committed.
1524 (b) In determining whether to release an inmate described by
1625 Subsection (a) on parole, a parole panel shall assess the growth and
1726 maturity of the inmate, taking into consideration:
1827 (1) the diminished culpability of juveniles, as
1928 compared to that of adults;
2029 (2) the hallmark features of youth; and
2130 (3) the greater capacity of juveniles for change, as
2231 compared to that of adults.
2332 (c) The board shall adopt a policy establishing factors for
2433 a parole panel to consider when reviewing for release on parole an
2534 inmate to whom this section applies to ensure that the inmate is
2635 provided a meaningful opportunity to obtain release. The policy
2736 must:
2837 (1) consider the age of the inmate at the time of the
2938 commission of the offense as a mitigating factor in favor of
3039 granting release on parole;
3140 (2) permit persons having knowledge of the inmate
3241 before the inmate committed the offense or having knowledge of the
3342 inmate's growth and maturity after the offense was committed to
3443 submit statements regarding the inmate for consideration by the
3544 parole panel; and
3645 (3) establish a mechanism for the outcome of a
3746 comprehensive mental health evaluation conducted by an expert
3847 qualified by education and clinical training in adolescent mental
3948 health issues to be considered by the parole panel.
4049 (d) This section does not:
4150 (1) affect the rights granted under this chapter or
4251 Article 56A.051, Code of Criminal Procedure, to a victim, guardian
4352 of a victim, or close relative of a deceased victim; or
4453 (2) create a legal cause of action.
4554 SECTION 2. Section 508.145, Government Code, is amended by
4655 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d-2) to read as
4756 follows:
4857 (b) An inmate serving a life sentence under Section
4958 12.31(a)(1), Penal Code, for a capital felony is not eligible for
5059 release on parole until the actual calendar time the inmate has
5160 served, without consideration of good conduct time, equals 30 [40]
5261 calendar years, except that an inmate serving a life sentence under
5362 Section 12.31(a)(1), Penal Code, for a capital felony under Section
5463 19.03(a)(1) or (7) of that code is not eligible for release on
5564 parole until the actual calendar time the inmate has served,
5665 without consideration of good conduct time, equals 40 calendar
5766 years.
5867 (d-2)(1) This subsection applies only to an inmate who:
5968 (A) is serving a sentence for:
6069 (i) a first degree felony described by
6170 Article 42A.054(a), Code of Criminal Procedure;
6271 (ii) an offense under Section 20A.03 or
6372 71.023, Penal Code; or
6473 (iii) a first degree felony under Section
6574 71.02, Penal Code; and
6675 (B) was younger than 17 years of age at the time
6776 the offense was committed.
6877 (2) Notwithstanding any other provision of this
6978 section, an inmate described by Subdivision (1) is not eligible for
7079 release on parole until the inmate's actual calendar time served,
71- without consideration of good conduct time, equals 30 calendar
80+ without consideration of good conduct time, equals 20 calendar
7281 years or one-half of the applicable time provided by this section,
7382 whichever is less, but in no event is the inmate eligible for
7483 release on parole in less than four calendar years unless the inmate
7584 would otherwise be eligible for release on parole under another
7685 provision of this section.
77- SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies to any
78- inmate who is confined in a facility operated by or under contract
79- with the Texas Department of Criminal Justice on or after the
80- effective date of this Act, regardless of whether the offense for
81- which the inmate is confined occurred before, on, or after the
82- effective date of this Act.
86+ SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
87+ to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
88+ An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
89+ governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
90+ and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
91+ purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
92+ effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
93+ before that date.
8394 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
84- ______________________________ ______________________________
85- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
86- I certify that H.B. No. 686 was passed by the House on April
87- 8, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 110, Nays 39, 1 present, not
88- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
89- No. 686 on May 30, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 6, 1
90- present, not voting.
91- ______________________________
92- Chief Clerk of the House
93- I certify that H.B. No. 686 was passed by the Senate, with
94- amendments, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays
95- 1.
96- ______________________________
97- Secretary of the Senate
98- APPROVED: __________________
99- Date
100- __________________
101- Governor
95+ * * * * *